+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
- Available for scheduling
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On February 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and passed
- Ordered immediately messaged
On February 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Made a special order of business at 2:00 PM on 2-22-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28
On February 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 9, Noes 2
On February 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On January 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On January 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Representative Tusler added as a coauthor
On January 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety
- Introduced by Representatives Jacque, Allen, Edming, Horlacher, Sanfelippo and Wichgers; cosponsored by Senators Wanggaard, Cowles and Marklein
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor