+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Published 3-29-2018
- Report approved by the Governor on 3-28-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 179
On March 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Presented to the Governor on 3-27-2018
On February 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Report correctly enrolled on 2-26-2018
On February 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate concurred in
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 21, Noes 11
- Rules suspended
- Read a second time
- Ordered to a third reading
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 2-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
- Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Available for scheduling
- Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
- Received from Assembly
On February 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adopted
- Read a second time
- Read a third time and passed
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Ordered immediately messaged
On February 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Made a special order of business at 1:11 PM on 2-15-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23
On February 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Stafsholt
On February 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 11, Noes 2
- Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 11, Noes 2
On January 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Representative Tusler added as a coauthor
On January 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On January 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kleefisch
- Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Stafsholt
On January 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On January 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage
- Introduced by Representatives Stafsholt, Kleefisch, Brandtjen, R. Brooks, Edming, Felzkowski, Jarchow, Krug, Pronschinske, Quinn, Skowronski and Tauchen; cosponsored by Senators Tiffany, Moulton and Wanggaard
+ − Amendments (3)
2017 ASA2-AB820
- Relating to: closure of a sport shooting range based on an unsafe condition.
2017 ASA1-AB820
- Relating to: closure of a sport shooting range based on an unsafe condition.
+ − Vote
February 20, 2018: Read a third time and concurred in
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 11
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor