+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
On March 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Published 3-25-2016
- Report approved by the Governor on 3-24-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 278
On March 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Presented to the Governor on 3-23-2016
On March 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Report correctly enrolled on 3-21-2016
On March 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate concurred in
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and concurred in
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 3-15-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
- Available for scheduling
- Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Workforce Development, Public Works, and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Workforce Development, Public Works, and Military Affairs
- Received from Assembly
On February 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read a second time
- Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Barca, Shankland, Jorgensen and Zamarripa
- Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Billings
- Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 63, Noes 34
- Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
- Read a third time and passed
- Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 63, Noes 34
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Representative Jarchow added as a coauthor
- Ordered immediately messaged
On February 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 2-16-2016 by Committee on Rules
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Mining and Rural Development, Ayes 10, Noes 5
- Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Mining and Rural Development, Ayes 15, Noes 0
On February 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On February 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Quinn
- Fiscal estimate received
On February 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On January 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Mining and Rural Development
- Introduced by Representatives Quinn, E. Brooks, Tranel, VanderMeer, Bernier, Kulp, Mursau, Novak, Krug, T. Larson, Nerison, Spiros, Edming, Ripp, Swearingen, Petryk, Czaja, Kitchens, Tauchen, A. Ott and Macco; cosponsored by Senators Marklein, Harsdorf, Roth, Gudex and Tiffany
+ − Amendments (3)
2015 ASA1-AB820
- Relating to: duties of the Public Service Commission under the broadband expansion grant program, eligible applicants under that program, certification of political subdivisions under that program, Medicaid expansion, eligibility for BadgerCare Plus and BadgerCare Plus Core, and making appropriations.
+ − Votes (2)
February 16, 2016: Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 34
February 16, 2016: Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 34
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor