+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Published 3-25-2016
- Report approved by the Governor on 3-24-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 279
On March 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Presented to the Governor on 3-23-2016
On March 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Report correctly enrolled on 3-18-2016
On March 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate concurred in
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read a second time
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and concurred in
- Senator L. Taylor added as a cosponsor
- Ordered immediately messaged
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 3-15-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Representative Shankland added as a coauthor
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On February 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Representative Genrich added as a coauthor
- Read a third time and passed
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
- Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
On February 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 2-9-2016 by Committee on Rules
On February 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 12, Noes 0
On January 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Executive session held
- Public hearing held
On January 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senator Harris Dodd added as a cosponsor
- Representatives Spreitzer, Kitchens and Pope added as coauthors
On January 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety
- Introduced by Representatives Ballweg, Bernier, Billings, E. Brooks, Czaja, Horlacher, Jacque, Johnson, Kahl, Kleefisch, Krug, Loudenbeck, Murphy, Novak, Nygren, A. Ott, Petryk, Rohrkaste, Schraa, Sinicki, Skowronski, Spiros, Subeck, Swearingen, C. Taylor, VanderMeer, Zamarripa, Ohnstad and Wachs; cosponsored by Senators Petrowski, Gudex, Harsdorf, C. Larson, Lassa and Olsen
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor