+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (31)
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On October 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Nass
On September 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Government Operations and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On September 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to committee on Government Operations and Consumer Protection, by the Senate President, pursuant to Senate Rule 20(1)(c)
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Education Reform and Government Operations
On March 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read a second time
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Zamarripa, Ohnstad, Sinicki, Kahl, Bowen, Brostoff, Stuck and Kolste
- Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 63, Noes 36
- Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Zamarripa, Ohnstad, Sinicki, Kahl, Bowen, Brostoff, Stuck, Kolste, Hesselbein and Genrich
- Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 63, Noes 36
- Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representatives Barca, Zamarripa, Shankland and Hebl
- Assembly Amendment 3 laid on table, Ayes 63, Noes 36
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and passed
- Representative Allen added as a coauthor
- Ordered immediately messaged
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On March 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 3-17-2015 by Committee on Rules
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations, Ayes 8, Noes 5
- Executive action taken
- Fiscal estimate received
On March 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On March 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Representative Heaton added as a coauthor
On March 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations
- Introduced by Representatives Ballweg, Bernier, Born, R. Brooks, Czaja, Edming, Horlacher, Jacque, Kleefisch, Knodl, Kulp, T. Larson, Loudenbeck, Murphy, Mursau, Petryk, Quinn, Rohrkaste, Spiros, Steffen, Tauchen, Thiesfeldt and Tittl; cosponsored by Senator Nass
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (3)
March 17, 2015: Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 36
March 17, 2015: Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 36
March 17, 2015: Assembly Amendment 3 laid on table
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 36
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor