+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On December 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Published 12-13-2013
- Report approved by the Governor on 12-12-2013. 2013 Wisconsin Act 71
On December 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Presented to the Governor on 12-10-2013
On September 26, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Report correctly enrolled on 9-26-2013
On September 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate concurred in
On September 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 18, Noes 15
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On September 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 9-17-2013 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On August 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report concurrence recommended by Natural Resources, Ayes 3, Noes 2
- Executive action taken
On August 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Natural Resources
On June 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On June 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read a second time
- Assembly Amendment 3 adopted
- Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
- Read a third time and passed
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Ordered immediately messaged
On June 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 6-6-2013 by Committee on Rules
On May 31, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 11, Noes 3
- Report Assembly Amendment 3 adoption recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 14, Noes 0
- Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 14, Noes 0
On May 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On May 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representatives Milroy and Kleefisch
On April 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Kleefisch
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kleefisch
On April 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On February 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage
- Introduced by Representatives Kleefisch and T. Larson; cosponsored by Senators Kedzie and Fitzgerald
+ − Amendments (3)
Assembly Amendment 3
Assembly Amendment 3 adopted
Assembly Amendment 2
Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Kleefisch
Assembly Amendment 1
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
+ − Vote
September 17, 2013: Read a third time and concurred in
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor