+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On April 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
- Available for scheduling
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On February 18, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and passed, Ayes 98, Noes 0
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Assembly Amendment 2 adopted
- Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
- Read a second time
On February 17, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Thiesfeldt and Kitchens
On February 13, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 14, Noes 0
- Placed on calendar 2-18-2020 by Committee on Rules
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 14, Noes 0
- Referred to committee on Rules
On February 11, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On February 4, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
- Fiscal estimate received
On January 29, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Senator Kooyenga added as a cosponsor
On January 28, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kitchens
On January 27, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Representative Brostoff added as a coauthor
On January 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced by Representatives Kitchens, Pope, Summerfield, Novak, Shankland, Hebl, Felzkowski, Anderson, Ballweg, Cabrera, Considine, Dittrich, Doyle, Edming, Emerson, Gruszynski, Kolste, Kulp, Magnafici, Milroy, Mursau, Neubauer, Ohnstad, Petryk, Quinn, Ramthun, Sargent, Sinicki, Skowronski, Spreitzer, Steffen, Stubbs, Stuck, Subeck, Swearingen, C. Taylor, Tranel, Vining, Zamarripa, Zimmerman, Vruwink, Billings, Tusler, Sortwell, Hintz, Plumer, Born and Ott; cosponsored by Senators Cowles, Miller, Testin, Olsen, Petrowski, Ringhand, Risser, Smith and Wanggaard
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
February 18, 2020: Read a third time and passed
- Yeas: 98
+ − Sponsors (57)
Type:
Primary Sponsor