+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On April 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On February 18, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Representative Hesselbein added as a coauthor
- Read a third time and passed, Ayes 98, Noes 0
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On February 13, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Report passage recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Placed on calendar 2-18-2020 by Committee on Rules
On February 12, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On February 10, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to joint committee on Finance
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Ayes 15, Noes 0
On February 7, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Senator Miller added as a cosponsor
On February 6, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On February 5, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On February 4, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
- Representative Edming added as a coauthor
- Public hearing held
On January 31, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Senator Testin added as a cosponsor
On January 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture
- Introduced by Representatives Tranel, Kurtz, Tauchen, Krug, Summerfield, Novak, Kitchens, Felzkowski, Shankland, Pope, Hebl, Kulp, Gruszynski, VanderMeer, Anderson, Zimmerman, Considine, Neubauer, Oldenburg, Sargent, Mursau, Ballweg, Doyle, Magnafici, Kolste, Petryk, Plumer, Swearingen, Vining, Stubbs, Subeck, Milroy, Katsma, C. Taylor, Quinn, Spreitzer, Sinicki, Emerson, Zamarripa, Ohnstad, Cabrera, Billings, Vruwink, Born, Ott and Spiros; cosponsored by Senators Cowles, Jacque, Petrowski, Feyen, Olsen, Wanggaard, Wirch and Smith
+ − Vote
February 18, 2020: Read a third time and passed
- Yeas: 98
+ − Sponsors (54)
Type:
Primary Sponsor