+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On April 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
- Available for scheduling
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On February 18, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and passed, Ayes 60, Noes 37
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On February 13, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Environment, Ayes 7, Noes 4
- Placed on calendar 2-18-2020 by Committee on Rules
- Referred to committee on Rules
On February 6, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On February 4, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On January 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Representative Wichgers added as a coauthor
- Public hearing held
- Representative Sinicki withdrawn as a coauthor
On January 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Environment
- Introduced by Representatives Brooks, Ballweg, Brandtjen, Edming, Knodl, Kulp, Loudenbeck, Magnafici, Mursau, Oldenburg, Petryk, Plumer, Ramthun, Sinicki, Skowronski, Sortwell, Tranel, Tusler, Zimmerman, Gundrum, Born, Allen, Ott and Spiros; cosponsored by Senators Marklein, Olsen and Wanggaard
+ − Vote
February 18, 2020: Read a third time and passed
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 37
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor