+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (53)
On March 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Report approved by the Governor on 3-22-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 273
- Published 3-23-2016
On March 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Presented to the Governor on 3-21-2016
- Report correctly enrolled on 3-21-2016
- LRB correction
On March 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate concurred in
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to a third reading
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Erpenbach, Miller, Vinehout, Harris Dodd, Ringhand, C. Larson, Wirch, Hansen, Lassa, Shilling and Bewley
- Read a second time
- Senate Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 19, Noes 13
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 32, Noes 0
- Senator Lassa added as a cosponsor
- Senator L. Taylor added as a cosponsor
- Ordered immediately messaged
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 3-15-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
- Public hearing held
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Health and Human Services
On February 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read a second time
- Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
- Assembly Amendment 2 adopted
- Assembly Amendment 3 adopted
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Representatives Shankland and Barca added as coauthors
- Ordered immediately messaged
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On February 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read a third time and passed, Ayes 94, Noes 0
On February 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Made a special order of business at 1:49 PM on 2-18-2016 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29
On February 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0
- Report Assembly Amendment 3 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0
- Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0
- Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0
On February 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Joint Committee on Finance
- Executive action taken
On February 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Mental Health Reform, Ayes 10, Noes 0
- Representative Spreitzer added as a coauthor
- Referred to joint committee on Finance
- Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Mental Health Reform, Ayes 10, Noes 0
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Mental Health Reform, Ayes 10, Noes 0
On February 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
- Representative Genrich added as a coauthor
- Fiscal estimate received
On January 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Rohrkaste
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Rohrkaste
On January 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Representative Katsma added as a coauthor
On January 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On January 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Mental Health Reform
- Introduced by Representatives Bernier, Kolste, Rohrkaste, Hesselbein, Novak, Tittl, Brostoff, Meyers, Skowronski, Macco, Jagler, Czaja, Petryk, Swearingen, Kleefisch, Quinn, Kitchens, Kahl, A. Ott, Ripp, Zepnick, Spiros, Subeck, Murphy, E. Brooks, Sargent, Kulp, Ballweg, Nygren, Ohnstad, Johnson, Sanfelippo, Considine, Steineke, Sinicki and Born; cosponsored by Senators Carpenter, Hansen and C. Larson
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (3)
March 15, 2016: Senate Amendment 1 laid on table
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 13
March 15, 2016: Read a third time and concurred in
- Yeas: 32
February 18, 2016: Read a third time and passed
- Yeas: 94
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor