+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On January 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On December 16, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On December 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced by Representatives Hesselbein, Milroy, Riemer, Sinicki, Hebl, Conley, Hong, Andraca, Anderson, Stubbs, Spreitzer, Subeck, Shelton, B. Meyers, S. Rodriguez and Considine; cosponsored by Senators Johnson, Carpenter, Smith, Agard, Larson and L. Taylor
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor