+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 8, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Published 4-9-2022
- Report approved by the Governor on 4-8-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 225
On April 4, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Presented to the Governor on 4-4-2022 by directive of the Speaker
On March 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Report correctly enrolled on 3-11-2022
On March 9, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate concurred in
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and concurred in
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 3-8-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On February 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On January 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Health
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On January 20, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and passed
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On January 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 1-20-2022 by Committee on Rules
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 15, Noes 0
On January 12, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On January 6, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On January 4, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On December 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Health
- Introduced by Representatives Kurtz, Brooks, Dittrich, Gundrum, Horlacher, Magnafici, Rozar, Skowronski, Tauchen, Tusler and Wichgers; cosponsored by Senators Felzkowski, Ballweg, Agard, Carpenter, Darling and Kooyenga
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor