+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Government Operations and Consumer Protection
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On February 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Representative Spreitzer added as a coauthor
- Read a third time and passed
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On February 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Made a special order of business at 1:40 PM on 2-18-2016 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 8, Noes 0
On February 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On February 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On January 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Consumer Protection
- Introduced by Representatives Rodriguez, Allen, Doyle, Horlacher, Knodl, T. Larson, A. Ott, Rohrkaste and Skowronski; cosponsored by Senators Carpenter and L. Taylor
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor