+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On February 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Representative Andraca added as a coauthor
On February 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Representative Spreitzer added as a coauthor
On December 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Health
- Introduced by Representatives Subeck, S. Rodriguez, Conley, Doyle, Hebl, Hesselbein, Ohnstad, Pope, Shankland, Sinicki, Snodgrass, Tusler and Vruwink; cosponsored by Senators Ringhand, Agard, Larson and Smith
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor