+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (47)
On March 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Published 3-29-2016
- Report approved by the Governor on 3-28-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 284
On March 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Presented to the Governor on 3-24-2016
- Report correctly enrolled on 3-24-2016
On March 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate concurred in
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 19, Noes 13
- Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senators Hansen, Wirch, C. Larson, Ringhand, Harris Dodd, Vinehout, Miller and Bewley
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Shilling, Risser, Erpenbach, Miller, Harris Dodd, Ringhand, C. Larson, Wirch, Hansen, Lassa and Bewley
- Read a second time
- Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senators Shilling, Risser, Erpenbach, Miller, Harris Dodd, Ringhand, C. Larson, Wirch, Hansen, Lassa and Bewley
- Senate Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 19, Noes 13
- Senate Amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 19, Noes 13
- Ordered to a third reading
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 19, Noes 13
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 3-15-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
- Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Withdrawn from committee on Universities and Technical Colleges and rereferred to committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c)
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Universities and Technical Colleges
- Received from Assembly
On February 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read a second time
- Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 63, Noes 35
- Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Shankland, Wachs, Danou, Hesselbein, Doyle, Mason, Goyke, Hintz, Meyers, Kessler, Spreitzer, Pope, Johnson, Berceau, Stuck, Hebl, Kolste, Billings, Young, Subeck, C. Taylor, Sargent and Bowen
- Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 63, Noes 35
- Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Mason, C. Taylor and Barca
- Read a third time and passed, Ayes 61, Noes 36, Paired 2
- Assembly Amendment 2 adopted
- Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative C. Taylor
- Assembly Amendment 3 laid on table, Ayes 63, Noes 35
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Ordered immediately messaged
On February 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Murphy
On February 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 2-16-2016 by Committee on Rules
On February 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and referred to committee on Rules
On February 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to joint committee on Finance
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 9, Noes 5
On January 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Executive session held
- Fiscal estimate received
On January 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Jorgensen, Wachs, Berceau, Billings and Hesselbein
On January 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On January 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
- Public hearing held
On January 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Colleges and Universities
- Introduced by Representatives Murphy, Krug, VanderMeer, Macco, Kulp, Gannon, Knudson, Neylon, Czaja, Mursau, Hintz, Kremer, Petryk, Duchow, Rohrkaste, Knodl, T. Larson, Quinn, Bernier, Ballweg, Kleefisch, Rodriguez, R. Brooks, A. Ott, Novak, Born, Tranel, Edming, Loudenbeck, Sanfelippo, Nerison and Kitchens; cosponsored by Senators Marklein, Gudex, Lasee, Moulton and Kapenga
+ − Amendments (8)
2015 SSA1-AB744
- Relating to: student loans, creating an authority to be known as the Wisconsin Student Loan Refinancing Authority, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation.
2015 ASA2-AB744
- Relating to: funding for Wisconsin grants for University of Wisconsin System students and making an appropriation.
2015 ASA1-AB744
- Relating to: Medicaid expansion, eligibility for BadgerCare Plus and BadgerCare Plus Core, funding for the University of Wisconsin System, and making an appropriation.
+ − Votes (8)
March 15, 2016: Read a third time and concurred in
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 13
March 15, 2016: Senate Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 13
March 15, 2016: Senate Amendment 1 laid on table
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 13
March 15, 2016: Senate Amendment 2 laid on table
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 13
February 16, 2016: Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 laid on table
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 35
February 16, 2016: Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 35
February 16, 2016: Assembly Amendment 3 laid on table
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 35
February 16, 2016: Read a third time and passed, Paired 2
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 36
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor