+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 1, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On March 26, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 10, Noes 5
- Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 15, Noes 0
On February 5, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On January 31, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Tranel
On January 29, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On January 16, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Health
- Introduced by Representatives Tranel, Novak, Kurtz, Oldenburg, VanderMeer, Brooks, Dittrich, Horlacher, Knodl, Krug, Kulp, Mursau, Quinn, Tusler, Born and Brandtjen; cosponsored by Senators Marklein, Nass, Olsen, Stroebel and Testin
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor