+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (43)
On March 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Published 3-31-2016
- Report approved by the Governor on 3-30-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 302
On March 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Presented to the Governor on 3-29-2016
On March 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Report correctly enrolled on 3-23-2016
On March 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate concurred in
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 19, Noes 13
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2
- Placed on calendar 3-15-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Elections and Local Government, Ayes 3, Noes 2
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Elections and Local Government
- Received from Assembly
On February 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 5 offered by Representative Sinicki
- Read a second time
- Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
- Assembly Amendment 3 adopted
- Assembly Amendment 4 offered by Representatives Kahl and Sinicki
- Assembly Amendment 4 laid on table, Ayes 63, Noes 35, Paired 1
- Ordered to a third reading
- Assembly Amendment 5 withdrawn and returned to author
- Assembly Amendment 6 laid on table, Ayes 63, Noes 35, Paired 1
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and passed, Ayes 63, Noes 35
- Representatives August and Jacque added as coauthors
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Assembly Amendment 6 offered by Representative Kahl
On February 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 2-16-2016 by Committee on Rules
On February 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Rohrkaste
On February 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations, Ayes 11, Noes 2
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations, Ayes 8, Noes 5
On February 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Representative Bernier added as a coauthor
On January 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Executive session held
On January 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Sinicki, Zamarripa, Brostoff, Kahl and Ohnstad
On January 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Rohrkaste
On January 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On January 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations
- Introduced by Representatives Rohrkaste, Vorpagel, Swearingen, Craig, Kleefisch, Czaja, Gannon, R. Brooks, Kremer, Jarchow, Kuglitsch, Kooyenga, Murphy, Katsma, Brandtjen, Quinn and A. Ott; cosponsored by Senators Roth, Lasee, Kapenga, LeMahieu, Gudex and Tiffany
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (4)
March 15, 2016: Read a third time and concurred in
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 13
February 16, 2016: Assembly Amendment 4 laid on table, Paired 1
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 35
February 16, 2016: Assembly Amendment 6 laid on table, Paired 1
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 35
February 16, 2016: Read a third time and passed
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 35
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor