+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (50)
On November 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Published 11-21-2019
- Report approved by the Governor on 11-20-2019. 2019 Wisconsin Act 28
On November 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Presented to the Governor on 11-14-2019 by directive of the Speaker
On November 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Report correctly enrolled on 11-13-2019
On November 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 3 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1)
- Received from Senate concurred in
On November 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 2 rejected, Ayes 19, Noes 14
- Read a second time
- Senate Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 19, Noes 14
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Carpenter
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 33, Noes 0
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Carpenter
On November 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 11-5-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
- Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2
- Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2
- Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
On June 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 3 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
- Read a second time
- Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
- Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author
- Assembly Amendment 3 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Wittke
- Rules suspended
- Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
- Read a third time and passed
- Ordered immediately messaged
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
- Senator Craig added as a cosponsor
On June 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to a third reading
On June 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Wittke
On June 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 8, Noes 0
- Report Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 8, Noes 0
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 8, Noes 0
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Placed on calendar 6-20-2019 by Committee on Rules
On May 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Representative Vining added as a coauthor
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
- Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Wittke
On May 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senator Kooyenga added as a cosponsor
On May 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Wittke
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Representative Brostoff added as a coauthor
On March 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On March 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On March 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Wittke
On March 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Introduced by Representatives Wittke, Hutton, Nygren, Kerkman, Zamarripa, Sinicki, Sanfelippo, Murphy, Sortwell, Kuglitsch, Neylon, Brandtjen, Horlacher, Duchow, Ramthun, Wichgers, Tusler, Plumer and Dittrich; cosponsored by Senators Wanggaard, Carpenter, Stroebel, Wirch, Nass, L. Taylor, Tiffany, Petrowski, Larson, Darling and Ringhand
+ − Amendments (7)
2019 ASA1-AB73
- Relating to: the imposition of sales and use taxes related to a local professional baseball park district and legislative oversight of such a district.
+ − Votes (3)
November 5, 2019: Senate Amendment 1 laid on table
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 14
November 5, 2019: Senate Amendment 2 rejected
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 14
November 5, 2019: Read a third time and concurred in
- Yeas: 33
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor