+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Environment and Forestry, Ayes 12, Noes 1
On February 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On January 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
- Representatives Allen and Krug added as coauthors
On January 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
- Fiscal estimate received
On January 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Environment and Forestry
- Introduced by Representatives Tittl, Genrich, Berceau, Czaja, Jacque, Kahl, Macco, Nygren, Ohnstad, A. Ott, Petryk, Shankland, Sinicki, Steffen, Subeck, Swearingen and Considine; cosponsored by Senators Cowles, Lassa, Hansen, Lasee, Petrowski, Tiffany and LeMahieu
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor