+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection
On November 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On November 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On November 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
- Read a third time and passed, Ayes 96, Noes 2
- Representatives Bowen and Tusler added as coauthors
- Ordered immediately messaged
On November 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Representative Milroy added as a coauthor
On November 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 11-11-2021 by Committee on Rules
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Forestry, Parks and Outdoor Recreation, Ayes 12, Noes 0
On November 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
- Fiscal estimate received
On November 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On October 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Forestry, Parks and Outdoor Recreation
- Introduced by Representatives Krug, Mursau, Edming, Callahan, Swearingen, Behnke, Spiros, Snyder, Moses, Rozar, Shankland, B. Meyers and Spreitzer; cosponsored by Senator Bewley
+ − Vote
November 11, 2021: Read a third time and passed
- Yeas: 96
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor