+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 1, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On January 29, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Representative Kurtz added as a coauthor
On January 23, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On December 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senator Jacque added as a cosponsor
On December 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government
- Introduced by Representatives Plumer, Novak, Felzkowski, Quinn, Steffen, Wichgers, Kulp, Magnafici, Tusler, Edming, Spiros and Schraa; cosponsored by Senators Bernier, Stroebel and Nass
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor