+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On March 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On March 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On March 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Representative Wichgers added as a coauthor
On March 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On February 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance
- Introduced by Representatives Sanfelippo, Spiros, Brandtjen, Jacque, Kremer, Kuglitsch, Mursau, Ott, Skowronski, Thiesfeldt, Tusler and Weatherston; cosponsored by Senators Kapenga, Craig, Marklein, Moulton and Testin
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor