+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
- Read first time and referred to committee on Economic Development and Commerce
On February 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Kerkman
- Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Barca and Jorgensen
- Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 63, Noes 35
- Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
- Read a second time
- Assembly Amendment 2 adopted
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and passed
- Ordered immediately messaged
On February 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 2-16-2016 by Committee on Rules
On February 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Jobs and the Economy, Ayes 11, Noes 3
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Jobs and the Economy, Ayes 11, Noes 3
- Referred to committee on Rules
On January 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Executive session held
On January 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kerkman
On January 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On January 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On January 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Representative Rohrkaste added as a coauthor
- Public hearing held
On January 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Jobs and the Economy
- Introduced by Representatives Kerkman, Macco, Jacque, C. Taylor, Berceau, R. Brooks, Danou, Duchow, Genrich, Horlacher, Jorgensen, Kessler, Kitchens, Kolste, Kremer, Kulp, T. Larson, Neylon, Novak, Petryk, Schraa, Spiros, Steffen, Subeck, Thiesfeldt, Tittl, Tranel and Young; cosponsored by Senators Hansen, Carpenter, Kapenga, C. Larson, Marklein, Nass, Ringhand, Risser, Vinehout, Wanggaard and L. Taylor
+ − Amendments (3)
2015 ASA1-AB669
- Relating to: reporting fraud against the Wisconsin Economic Development Corporation, providing fraudulent information to the Wisconsin Economic Development Corporation, and providing a criminal penalty.
+ − Vote
February 16, 2016: Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 35
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor