+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On January 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Laid on the table
On January 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Representative Cabrera added as a coauthor
On January 20, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 1-25-2022 by Committee on Rules
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 13, Noes 0
On December 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On November 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On November 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On October 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced by Representatives Spiros, Moses, Mursau, Subeck and Wichgers; cosponsored by Senators Petrowski, Carpenter, Cowles and Ballweg
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor