+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Published 3-4-2020
- Report approved by the Governor on 3-3-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 120
On February 28, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Presented to the Governor on 2-28-2020 by directive of the Speaker
On February 25, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Report correctly enrolled on 2-25-2020
On February 20, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate concurred in
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read a second time
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and concurred in
- Ordered immediately messaged
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 2-19-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
- Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On January 21, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read a second time
- Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a third time and passed
- Ordered immediately messaged
On January 16, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 1-21-2020 by Committee on Rules
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Substance Abuse and Prevention, Ayes 9, Noes 0
- Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Substance Abuse and Prevention, Ayes 9, Noes 0
- Fiscal estimate received
On January 15, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On January 10, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Nygren
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On January 7, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On January 6, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Representative Stuck added as a coauthor
On December 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Representative Wichgers added as a coauthor
On December 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Substance Abuse and Prevention
- Introduced by Representatives Nygren, Plumer, Allen, Novak, Snyder, Petersen, Kitchens, Felzkowski, Edming, Kulp, Magnafici, Rohrkaste, Tusler, Petryk, Dittrich, Tranel, Thiesfeldt, Jagler, Zimmerman, Spiros, Mursau, Ramthun, Born and Billings; cosponsored by Senators Darling, Olsen, Wanggaard and Marklein
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor