+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Published 4-9-2014
- Report approved by the Governor on 4-8-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 201
On April 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Presented to the Governor on 4-7-2014
On March 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Report correctly enrolled on 3-26-2014
- LRB correction
On March 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate concurred in
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and concurred in
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 3-18-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
- Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
- Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
- Available for scheduling
On February 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and passed
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
- Representative Barca added as a coauthor
On February 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 2-18-2014 by Committee on Rules
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Veterans, Ayes 16, Noes 0
On February 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
- Public hearing held
On January 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Veterans
- Introduced by Representatives Nass, Petryk, Hesselbein, Kulp, Kolste, Murphy, LeMahieu, Pridemore, T. Larson, Vruwink, Bernard Schaber, Marklein, Bernier, Ripp and Bies; cosponsored by Senators Petrowski, Kedzie, Lehman, Olsen and Schultz
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor