+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Report approved by the Governor on 4-3-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 198
- Published 4-4-2018
On April 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Presented to the Governor on 4-2-2018
On January 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Report correctly enrolled on 1-29-2018
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On January 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read a second time
- Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and passed
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
- Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Senate Organization and take up
- Read a second time
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and concurred in
- Ordered immediately messaged
On January 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate concurred in
On January 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 7, Noes 0
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 7, Noes 0
- Placed on calendar 1-23-2018 by Committee on Rules
On January 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On January 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Hutton
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On November 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Representative Spiros added as a coauthor
On November 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Housing and Real Estate
- Introduced by Representatives Hutton and E. Brooks; cosponsored by Senators Feyen and Olsen