+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 1, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On March 25, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Representative Ohnstad added as a coauthor
On January 2, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On November 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Representative Stubbs added as a coauthor
On November 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced by Representatives Doyle, Crowley, Vining, Subeck, Zamarripa, C. Taylor, Sinicki, Sargent, Pope, Neubauer, Hebl, Emerson, Brostoff, Bowen, Billings and Anderson; cosponsored by Senators L. Taylor, Larson, Smith and Wirch
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor