+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Laid on the table
On February 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 2-16-2016 by Committee on Rules
On February 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 11, Noes 0
On February 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On January 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On December 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Health
- Introduced by Representative Sanfelippo; cosponsored by Senator Vukmir
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor