+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Laid on the table
On February 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 2-13-2014 by Committee on Rules
On February 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations, Ayes 14, Noes 0
On February 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On February 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On January 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations
- Introduced by Representatives Ripp, Bies, Brooks, Clark, Czaja, Danou, Jagler, Jorgensen, Loudenbeck, Marklein, Murphy, Pridemore, Ringhand, A. Ott, Spiros, Strachota, Tranel and Wright; cosponsored by Senators Olsen, Harsdorf, Cowles, Darling, Erpenbach, Grothman, Gudex, Jauch, Kedzie, Lasee, Lassa, Moulton and Schultz
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor