+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 3, Noes 2
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
- Public hearing held
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
On January 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read a second time
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and passed
- Ordered immediately messaged
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On January 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 1-22-2015 by committee on Rules
On January 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 5, Noes 3
On January 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On January 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On January 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced by Representative J. Ott
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor