+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On February 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and passed
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Assembly Amendment 2 adopted
- Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Kleefisch and Jacque
- Assembly Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author
- Read a second time
On February 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Representative Barca added as a coauthor
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Jacque
On February 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Made a special order of business at 1:17 PM on 2-20-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 26
On January 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 13, Noes 0
On December 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
- Representative Vruwink added as a coauthor
On December 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On December 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Representative Loudenbeck added as a coauthor
On November 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On October 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Colleges and Universities
- Introduced by Representatives Kleefisch, Riemer, Bernier, Anderson, Berceau, Born, E. Brooks, R. Brooks, Considine, Genrich, Goyke, Horlacher, Kolste, Knodl, Mursau, Novak, Pope, Spreitzer, C. Taylor and Tusler; cosponsored by Senators Darling, Bewley, L. Taylor and Vinehout
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor