+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On April 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On February 18, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and passed
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On February 13, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 2-18-2020 by Committee on Rules
On January 28, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 9, Noes 0
On January 16, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On January 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- LRB correction
On January 7, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On December 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Representative Allen added as a coauthor
On December 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Representative Brooks added as a coauthor
On November 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Housing and Real Estate
- Introduced by Representatives Horlacher, Stuck, Anderson, Dittrich, Kuglitsch, Murphy, Spiros, Subeck and Tusler; cosponsored by Senators Olsen and Bewley
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor