+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On February 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and passed
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Assembly Amendment 3 adopted
- Read a second time
On February 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
- Report Assembly Amendment 3 adoption recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 9, Noes 4
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 9, Noes 4
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Made a special order of business at 1:15 PM on 2-20-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 26
On February 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Vorpagel
On December 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Billings
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Billings
On December 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On December 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On November 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Representative Vruwink added as a coauthor
On October 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced by Representatives Vorpagel, Allen, Ballweg, R. Brooks, Considine, Felzkowski, Fields, Horlacher, Jacque, Kulp, Thiesfeldt and VanderMeer; cosponsored by Senators Feyen, Olsen and Wanggaard
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor