+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Published 3-31-2016
- Report approved by the Governor on 3-30-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 325
On March 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Presented to the Governor on 3-29-2016
On March 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Report correctly enrolled on 3-18-2016
On March 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate concurred in
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and concurred in
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 3-15-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
- Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On February 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and passed
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
- Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
On February 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 2-9-2016 by Committee on Rules
On February 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Insurance, Ayes 11, Noes 0
On January 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Executive session held
On January 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On January 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On December 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance
- Introduced by Representatives Nygren, Ballweg, Czaja, Gannon, Thiesfeldt and Novak; cosponsored by Senators Lasee, Marklein, Stroebel and Olsen
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor