+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Published 6-24-2017
- Report approved by the Governor on 6-23-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 23
On June 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Presented to the Governor on 6-21-2017
On May 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Report correctly enrolled on 5-23-2017
On May 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate concurred in
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and concurred in
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 5-10-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
- Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
- Available for scheduling
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On May 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and passed
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On April 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 5-2-2017 by Committee on Rules
On March 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 11, Noes 1
On March 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On March 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On February 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety
- Introduced by Representatives Jacque, Steffen, Spiros, Kremer, Bernier, Genrich, Nygren, Jarchow, Gannon, Kerkman, Tittl, Wichgers, Mursau, E. Brooks, Thiesfeldt, Tusler, Brandtjen, Skowronski, Allen and Shankland; cosponsored by Senators Cowles, Wanggaard, Olsen and Marklein
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor