+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On July 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Published 7-6-2013
- Report approved by the Governor on 7-5-2013. 2013 Wisconsin Act 22
On July 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Presented to the Governor on 7-3-2013
On May 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Report correctly enrolled on 5-16-2013
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
- Read a third time and concurred in
- Ordered immediately messaged
On May 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate concurred in
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 5-14-2013 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Executive action taken
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Financial Institutions and Rural Issues
On April 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Rules suspended
- Read a second time
- Ordered to a third reading
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On April 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Representatives Barca, Vruwink, Wright, Hintz, Wachs, Bernard Schaber, Sargent, Barnes, Kolste, Bies, Jagler, Spiros, Tittl and Williams added as coauthors
- Read a third time and passed
- Ordered immediately messaged
On April 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 4-9-2013 by Committee on Rules
On April 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions, Ayes 12, Noes 0
On March 27, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Executive session held
On March 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On March 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On March 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Senator Lassa added as a cosponsor
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions
- Introduced by Representatives Craig, Marklein, Czaja, Genrich, Jacque, Kahl, Ohnstad, Sanfelippo, Zepnick and Weininger; cosponsored by Senators Schultz, Lasee, Grothman and Petrowski
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor