+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 1, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 20, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Laid on the table
On February 18, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Made a special order of business at 10:19 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21
- Senator Larson added as a cosponsor
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 12, Noes 0
On February 4, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On January 31, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Spiros
On January 28, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Representative Skowronski added as a coauthor
- Public hearing held
On January 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On October 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced by Representatives Spiros, Considine, Knodl, Kulp, Mursau, Oldenburg, Plumer, Ramthun, Tauchen, Tusler and Wichgers; cosponsored by Senators Petrowski, Olsen and Tiffany
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor