+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
- Available for scheduling
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On February 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and passed, Ayes 70, Noes 25
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Assembly Amendment 2 adopted
- Read a second time
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senator L. Taylor added as a cosponsor
On February 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Made a special order of business at 1:10 PM on 2-20-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 26
On January 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 9, Noes 0
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 6, Noes 3
On January 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On January 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Krug
On December 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Representative Tittl added as a coauthor
On December 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Representative Pope withdrawn as a coauthor
On December 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
- Fiscal estimate received
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Krug
On October 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Consumer Protection
- Introduced by Representatives Krug, Anderson, Ballweg, E. Brooks, Kremer, Kulp, Mursau, Novak, Petersen, Pope, Pronschinske, Quinn, C. Taylor, Ripp, Sargent, Skowronski, Subeck and Vorpagel; cosponsored by Senators Petrowski, Feyen, Moulton, Olsen, Vinehout and Wanggaard
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
February 20, 2018: Read a third time and passed
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 25
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor