+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On May 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Representative Drake added as a coauthor
On March 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Laid on the table
On March 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Brooks
On March 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 3-17-2021 by Committee on Rules
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 9, Noes 0
On March 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On February 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
- Representative Brostoff added as a coauthor
On February 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Representative Callahan added as a coauthor
- Fiscal estimate received
On February 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform
- Introduced by Representatives Brooks, Gundrum, Allen, Moses, Skowronski and Ortiz-Velez; cosponsored by Senators Bernier, Cowles and Bewley
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor