+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On January 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Environment and Forestry, Ayes 7, Noes 3
- Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Environment and Forestry, Ayes 7, Noes 3
On January 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On December 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kremer
On November 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Representative Wichgers added as a coauthor
On November 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On November 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On October 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Environment and Forestry
- Introduced by Representatives Kremer, Horlacher, Allen, August, Born, R. Brooks, Gannon, Hutton, Jacque, Jarchow, Knodl, Kuglitsch, Murphy and Skowronski; cosponsored by Senators Stroebel, Craig, Nass, Kapenga and Wanggaard
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor