+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On March 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 6, Noes 5
On February 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On January 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On October 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced by Representatives Horlacher, Kremer, Jacque, August, Born, Brandtjen, R. Brooks, Duchow, Gannon, Hutton, Jarchow, Katsma, Kerkman, Knodl, Kooyenga, Kuglitsch, Murphy, Neylon, Rodriguez, Sanfelippo, Skowronski and Weatherston; cosponsored by Senators Kapenga, Stroebel, Craig, Nass and Wanggaard
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor