+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (34)
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on Senate Organization
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 2-16-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
- Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Workforce Development, Public Works, and Military Affairs, Ayes 3, Noes 2
- Executive action taken
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senators C. Larson and Lassa
- Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senators C. Larson and Lassa
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators C. Larson and Lassa
- Senate Amendment 4 offered by Senators C. Larson and Lassa
- Senate Amendment 3 offered by Senators C. Larson and Lassa
- Senate Amendment 5 offered by Senators C. Larson and Lassa
- Senate Amendment 6 offered by Senators Lassa and C. Larson
- Senate Amendment 7 offered by Senators Lassa and C. Larson
On January 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Workforce Development, Public Works, and Military Affairs
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On January 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 2 adopted
- Read a second time
- Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and passed
On January 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative August
On January 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 1-12-2016 by Committee on Rules
On December 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Energy and Utilities, Ayes 12, Noes 3
- Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Energy and Utilities, Ayes 12, Noes 3
On December 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On December 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative August
On December 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On December 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Energy and Utilities
- Introduced by Representatives August, Zepnick, Sanfelippo, Murphy, Kleefisch, Knodl and Skowronski; cosponsored by Senator Lasee
+ − Amendments (10)
2015 SSA1-AB554
- Relating to: prohibiting sales or leases of municipal water or sewer utilities to investor-owned utilities.
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor