+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On October 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On October 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On September 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On September 27, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
- Fiscal estimate received
On September 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance
- Introduced by Representatives Subeck, Cabrera, Anderson, Conley, Considine, Doyle, Emerson, Hebl, Hesselbein, Hong, Milroy, Neubauer, Ohnstad, Pope, S. Rodriguez, Shankland, Shelton, Sinicki, Snodgrass, Spreitzer, Stubbs and Vruwink; cosponsored by Senators Erpenbach, Johnson, Agard, Bewley, Carpenter, Larson, Pfaff and Ringhand
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor