+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 1, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On November 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On November 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On October 31, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On October 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On October 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs
- Introduced by Representatives Vorpagel, Brostoff and Sinicki; cosponsored by Senators Feyen and L. Taylor