+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On March 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 9, Noes 4
On October 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On October 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On September 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Health
- Introduced by Representatives Brandtjen, Allen, Brooks, Cabral-Guevara, Callahan, Edming, Gundrum, Horlacher, Murphy, Ramthun, Rozar, Sanfelippo, Schraa, Skowronski, Steffen, Thiesfeldt, Tittl and Wichgers; cosponsored by Senators Jacque and Bernier
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor