+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Report approved by the Governor on 3-28-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 146
- Published 3-29-2018
On March 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Presented to the Governor on 3-27-2018
On January 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Report correctly enrolled on 1-30-2018
On January 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate concurred in
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 23, Noes 8
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 1-23-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
- Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
On January 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On January 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and passed
- Ordered immediately messaged
On January 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 1-16-2018 by Committee on Rules
On January 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Government Accountability and Oversight, Ayes 4, Noes 3
On December 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On November 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
- Representative Vruwink withdrawn as a coauthor
On October 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Accountability and Oversight
- Introduced by Representatives Knodl, Horlacher, Kremer, Spiros, Tittl, Vruwink, Felzkowski, R. Brooks, Kooyenga, Tusler, Gannon, Swearingen, Kuglitsch, Sanfelippo and Duchow; cosponsored by Senators Darling, Petrowski and Craig
+ − Vote
January 23, 2018: Read a third time and concurred in
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 8
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor