+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 1, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On March 5, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On March 4, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Goyke
On October 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On October 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Introduced by Representatives Goyke, Bowen, Brostoff, Anderson, Considine, Crowley, Hebl, Haywood, Sinicki, Ohnstad, L. Myers, Hintz and C. Taylor; cosponsored by Senators Johnson, Larson, Bewley and Carpenter
+ − Amendment
2019 ASA1-AB521
- Relating to: authorizing an additional county sales tax, creating additional property tax credits, and making an appropriation.
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor