+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Published 3-29-2018
- Report approved by the Governor on 3-28-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 148
On March 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Presented to the Governor on 3-27-2018
On February 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Report correctly enrolled on 2-27-2018
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended
- Read a second time
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 18, Noes 14
- Ordered immediately messaged
On February 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate concurred in
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 2-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
- Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
On November 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
On November 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
- Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and passed, Ayes 60, Noes 33
On November 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On November 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 11-9-2017 by Committee on Rules
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Workforce Development, Ayes 10, Noes 5
- Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Workforce Development, Ayes 15, Noes 0
On November 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On October 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Hutton
On October 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On September 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Workforce Development
- Introduced by Representatives Hutton, Rohrkaste, Allen, Bernier, Brandtjen, E. Brooks, Felzkowski, Gannon, Horlacher, Katsma, Knodl, Kremer, Krug, Kulp, Macco, Neylon, Petersen, Sanfelippo, Spiros, Thiesfeldt, Tittl and Tusler; cosponsored by Senators Kapenga, Craig, Darling, Feyen, Lasee, Marklein, Nass, Stroebel, Vukmir and Wanggaard
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 20, 2018: Read a third time and concurred in
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 14
November 9, 2017: Read a third time and passed
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 33
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor