+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On January 20, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Laid on the table
On January 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 1-20-2022 by Committee on Rules
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Energy and Utilities, Ayes 13, Noes 0
On December 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On October 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On August 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On August 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Energy and Utilities
- Introduced by Representatives Spiros, Murphy, Rozar, Tusler and VanderMeer; cosponsored by Senators Cowles and Darling